Ardal Weinidogaeth Bro Ardudwy Ministry Area

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Please view the TAR for the list of activities that the charity has undertaken for this year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 23 March 2012: Standard registration
- CHURCH IN WALES PARISH OF BRO ARDUDWY (Previous name)
- CHURCH IN WALES PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF LLANABER WITH BARMOUTH (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Owain Gwilym Pritchard | Chair | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Foskett | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Linda Rosemary Baily | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LLEWELYN RICHARDS | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Cadwell | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Wood | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Garth Wigglesworth | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Tecwyn Williams | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Hughes | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Joy Wynn Lloyd | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sue Gaynor Jones | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Millie Christina Edwards | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.31k | £61.49k | £61.49k | £82.74k | £72.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.28k | £98.73k | £99.66k | £132.56k | £105.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/01/1956 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02 SEP 2015 as amended on 27 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL, IN THE PARISH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Hall
DYFFRYN ARDUDWY
LL44 2EP
- Phone:
- 01341555550
- Email:
- enquiries@broardudwy.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window