GREEN CARE (ZAMBIA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Building community based schools for orphans in rural Zambia. Drilling bore holes for clean drinking and feeding and clothing the orphans.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Zambia
Governance
- 29 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AARON JUMBA MBA | Chair | 15 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SATU LUNGU | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr TAVEYI MHAZO | Trustee | 15 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2020 | 01/06/2021 | 01/06/2022 | 01/06/2023 | 01/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | 13 April 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 June 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 June 2020 | 05 January 2022 | 279 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/01/2011 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2012
Charitable objects
1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN CHOMA, ZAMBIA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS, FOOD, CLOTHING AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN CHOMA, ZAMBIA BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION. 3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE LIVING IN CHOMA, ZAMBIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Dorset Avenue
Wigston
LE18 4WD
- Phone:
- 07920291797
- Email:
- aaronjumba@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window