Financial history CALVARY APOSTOLIC ASSEMBLY

Charity number: 1146092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £336.75k £378.58k £440.89k £522.13k £538.78k
Total expenditure £256.47k £324.52k £548.56k £468.17k £463.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £414.83k £455.30k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £80.70k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.08k £2.79k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £106.22k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £468.17k £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £463.72k