CHRIST CHURCH, WOODBURY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday Services with creche facility; Sunday Clubs for children during part of the service; Coffee Meeting after the service; Church Lunch on 1st Sunday of month; weekly Christian Youth Groups; Smoothie Bar (during term time) to encourage the young of the church & village to meet socially together; weekly Parent & Toddler Group: Annual Village Fun Day and Open Air Carol Service with Parish Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 02 May 2012: Standard registration
- 18 December 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 December 2023: Funds transferred to 1202087 CHRIST CHURCH WOODBURY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.00k | £159.97k | £118.29k | £95.66k | £92.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.52k | £135.29k | £125.34k | £90.97k | £97.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09/12/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window