ABINGTON AVENUE U R C

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious and associated activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 23 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon John Whipp | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Madzadzavara | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Kay Dian Kerr | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Croft | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Patricia Whipp | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Julia Hardcastle | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Jeffery Charles Prickett | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Stapleton | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Cottle | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.13k | £140.85k | £134.04k | £127.59k | £140.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £166.64k | £159.46k | £147.25k | £147.67k | £150.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | £9.17k | N/A | £1.74k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH ACTS (1972 AND 1981) AND SCHEME OF UNION (1972) ADOPTED 20/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SCHEME OF UNION OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
ABINGTON AVENUE
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 4QA
- Phone:
- 01604604623
- Email:
- OFFICE.AAURC@BTCONNECT.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window