MEDWAY CARES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was set up to - promote and protect the physical and mental health of the public through financial assistance, support, education and practical advice; - relieve poverty and other need, in particular by reason of youth, age, ill health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage. Since its inception the charity has operated as a grant making body.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 19 January 2012: Standard registration
- THAMES GATEWAY HEALTH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yin Kiu Lam | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Suzanne Sadler | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Condron | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Reynolds | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Adgie | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Jayne Bland | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.67k | £25.40k | £18.83k | £14.98k | £15.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.43k | £13.86k | £18.54k | £7.36k | £20.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO (1) PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; (2) RELIEVE POVERTY AND OTHER CHARITABLE NEED AMONGST THOSE IN NEED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
M C H House
Bailey Drive
Gillingham Business Park
Gillingham
ME8 0PZ
- Phone:
- 01634337593
- Email:
- louise.parker4@nhs.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window