PAN ASIAN WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraise to benefit teenage girls' education in Asia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
- Cambodia
- India
- Malaysia
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Sri Lanka
- Thailand
Governance
- 02 August 2012: Standard registration
- PAWA (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Keith Timmins | Trustee | 23 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Mariam Muhiudeen | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Azlinda Ezrina binti Ariffin | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|||||
ZEHAN ALBAKRI | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
BETTY YAO MBE | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.90k | £159.45k | £117.78k | £68.07k | £99.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.55k | £68.25k | £79.27k | £61.74k | £85.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 AUG 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/07/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/11/2015
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF WOMEN AND GIRLS IN ASIA, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; AND 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROMOTION OF FINANCIAL SELF-SUFFICIENCY AS A MEANS OF PREVENTION OF POVERTY AMONG WOMEN AND GIRLS IN ASIA BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO PAY FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 16
1 SLOANE COURT EAST
LONDON
SW3 4TQ
- Phone:
- 02072446208
- Email:
- info@pawa-london.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window