REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ('RCCG') SOLUTION CONNECTIONS, (FRUITFUL VINE PROJECT)

Charity Number: 1145834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives of the RCCG Solution Connections Manchester are: the advancement of the Christian faith worldwide in accordance with the doctrines set out in the Statement of Faith schedule of the Charity Trust Deed and the relief of poverty. The Charity also engages in youth and community development activities in line with the United Kingdom Charities Act 2006.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,309
Total expenditure: £4,108

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City
  • Nigeria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • RCCG SOLUTIONS CONNECTIONS (FRUITFUL VINE PROJECT) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
OLUSOLA YETUNDE AJAYI Trustee 05 January 2016
None on record
OLUGBENGA AKINKUNMI OGUNSOLA Trustee 05 January 2016
None on record
SADE HELEN LAMIKANRA Trustee 09 February 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.04k £3.24k £6.81k £3.23k £3.31k
Total expenditure £11.42k £3.72k £7.25k £5.46k £4.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 August 2024 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30 CORBY STREET
MANCHESTER
M12 5WX
Phone:
07960255655
Website:

No information available