Accounts and annual returns STANLEY HEAD LIMITED

Charity number: 1146223
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 18 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 26 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2015 23 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2014 11 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2014 Not Required