Accounts and annual returns KIDS IN COMMUNICATION

Charity number: 1145968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 29 January 2025 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 15 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 03 April 2022 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 03 April 2022 489 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required