KIDS RUN FREE LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kids Run Free organise running events for children of all abilities aged 0-16 in parks and schools, all year round. All events are free. We aim to encourage participation and all children are given a reward after a race. We try to make the events family occasions, encouraging parents to come along with their children, and make use of the recreational facilities in their neighbourhood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 March 2012: Standard registration
- 02 October 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- Marathon Kids UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.70k | £274.46k | £185.19k | £168.62k | £46.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £240.15k | £268.52k | £186.03k | £184.87k | £129.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.34k | £88.35k | £15.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/02/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/02/2012
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH PARTICULARLY AMONGST CHILDREN BY MEANS OF PROVIDING AND PROMOTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN TO TAKE PART IN RUNNING RACES THROUGHOUT THE UK 2. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.”
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window