HUDDERSFIELD TOWN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to advance in life and help young people through the provision of recreational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions of life and provide support and activities which develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£1,155,370
Donations and legacies | £48.54k | |
Charitable activities | £1.01m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £30.49k | |
Other | £70.20k |
Total expenditure:
£1,263,104
Raising funds | £27.51k | |
Charitable activities | £1.24m | |
Other | £0 |
£47,191 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £42,300 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £27.51k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.24m |
People

31 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
Governance
- 22 March 2012: Standard registration
- BLUE & WHITE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- HUDDERSFIELD TOWN FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Griffiths | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Totten | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Andrew | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|||||
David Threlfall-Sykes | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robyn Kennerdale | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Bennett | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Delroy Beverley | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Gonzalez | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.03m | £1.00m | £1.61m | £1.17m | £1.16m | |
|
Total expenditure | £896.25k | £887.93k | £1.02m | £1.23m | £1.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.40k | £72.58k | £41.23k | £47.93k | £42.30k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £309.66k | £207.56k | £556.95k | £37.68k | £48.54k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £65.97k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £653.52k | £784.68k | £898.45k | £898.98k | £1.01m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.23k | £30.49k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £9.71k | £154.85k | £236.36k | £70.20k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £520.37k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £847.06k | £866.88k | £989.78k | £1.22m | £1.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £49.18k | £21.05k | £35.10k | £11.20k | £27.51k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £64.28k | £21.71k | £8.43k | £66.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £76.28k | £109.76k | £62.90k | £12.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £32.51k | £12.94k | £8.18k | £25.66k | £20.98k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £352.45k | £362.27k | £399.93k | |
|
Other assets | £873.55k | £940.67k | £1.17m | £1.02m | £1.04m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £220.86k | £154.38k | £169.02k | £93.39k | £203.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 JAN 2018 as amended on 21 Jan 2022 as amended on 04 Nov 2021 as amended on 01 Feb 2022 as amended on 01 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
3. Objects 3.1 The Charity's objects (Objects) are for the benefit of the public generally, both in the United Kingdom and overseas and, in particular, the inhabitants of Kirklees and Calderdale, West Yorkshire and its surrounding areas: 3.1.1 to promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for the playing of association football and other sports capable of improving health (facilities in this Article 3 means land, buildings, equipment and organising sporting activities); 3.1.2 to provide and assist in providing facilities for sport, recreation or other leisure time occupation of such persons who have need for such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, poverty or social and economic welfare and with the object of improving their conditions of life; 3.1.3 to advance the education of the general public through such means as the Trustees think fit in accordance with charity law; 3.1.4 to advance in life, and help, people through: 3.1.4.1 the provision of recreational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions of life: and 3.1.4.2 providing support and activities which develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature responsible individuals; 3.1.5 to help people, especially but not exclusively through leisure time activities so as to develop their capabilities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society; 3.1.6 to assist in the relief of sickness and the preservation of health among people; 3.1.7 to assist in the relief of financial hardship, either general or individually, of people by making grants of money for providing or paying for items, services or facilities; and 3.1.8 for such other charitable objects for the benefit of the public as the Trustees in their absolute discretion may determine.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Huddersfield Town AFC
Stadium Way
HUDDERSFIELD
HD1 6PG
- Phone:
- 01484 503 773
- Email:
- finance@htafcfoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window