AL-BAYAN WELFARE CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are holding classes for adults to read and write Arabic correctly for sisters? and Men. We have a library where people can come and get books as well as listen to Islamic bayan.We are currently distributing leaflets and booklets to Non- Muslims in the area, as well as distributing Islamic literature door to door. We have lectures and talks from well known scholars and Imams; local and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Enfield
- Newham
- Redbridge
Governance
- 12 June 2012: Standard registration
- AL-BAYAN WELFARE CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Omar Ali Abdalla | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
KHALID ALI ABDALLA | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.00k | £29.46k | £102.83k | £125.13k | £135.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.57k | £42.33k | £101.65k | £101.65k | £135.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 03 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/05/2012
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PREVENTING YOUNG SOMALIAN AND OTHER LOCAL GROUPS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). 2.FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR SOMALIAN AND OTHER LOCAL GROUPS OF YOUNG PEOPLE [UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS] IN GREATER LONDON IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE BOROUGH OF NEWHAM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: •AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; •PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 3.THE RELIEF OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELLING, COMMUNITY CARE, SUPPORT AND WELFARE GUIDANCE. 4.THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY OTHER OBJECT AGREED BY THE CHARITY TRUSTEES AND APPROVED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Al Bayan Welfare Centre
55 Green Lane
ILFORD
Essex
IG1 1XG
- Phone:
- 07740827298
- Email:
- khaliddawa@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window