Accounts and annual returns BRENT CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1148127
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 February 2025 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 February 2025 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 September 2024 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 September 2024 221 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 April 2023 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 April 2023 68 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 February 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 February 2022 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window