UK RESEARCH INTEGRITY OFFICE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UKRIO offers support to the public, researchers and organisations to further good practice in academic, scientific and medical research. We promote integrity and ethical standards in all disciplines, through publications on research practice, services we provide to organisations, our education and training activities, and by providing expert guidance in response to requests for assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £12,741 from 1 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 April 2012: Standard registration
- NONE (Working name)
- UK RESEARCH INTEGRITY OFFICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Sir Ian Lamont Boyd | Chair | 04 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Prof Sir James Smith FRS | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Huw Morris | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Kolstoe | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Inke Nathke | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pierre Espinasse | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Zoe Hammatt JD MPhil | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Tracey Brown OBE | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sarah Harper CBE | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225.22k | £269.81k | £247.08k | £277.48k | £344.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.97k | £134.92k | £264.76k | £257.88k | £415.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.74k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30/03/2012 as amended on 20 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT GOOD PRACTICE IN THE GOVERNANCE, MANAGEMENT AND CONDUCT OF MEDICAL, SCIENTIFIC AND ACADEMIC RESEARCH, INCLUDING THE FIELDS OF MEDICINE AND HEALTHCARE, PHYSICAL SCIENCES, ENGINEERING, MATHEMATICS AND COMPUTING, SOCIAL SCIENCES AND SOCIAL CARE, LAW, THE ARTS AND HUMANITIES, AND RELATED DISCIPLINES; AND (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN THE CONDUCT OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Impact Hub London Euston
1 Triton Square
LONDON
NW1 3DX
- Phone:
- 020 3828 1325
- Email:
- info@ukrio.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window