NECTAR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to relieve poverty and provide assistance to the needy in all parts of the world affected by war, natural disasters or catastrophes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Benin
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Chad
- Comoros
- Congo
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- India
- Indonesia
- Iraq
- Italy
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Morocco
- Niger
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Qatar
- Senegal
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Syria
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Yemen
Governance
- 27 March 2012: Standard registration
- NECTAR TRUST (Working name)
- QCUK (Working name)
- QATAR CHARITY (QCUK) (Previous name)
- QATAR CHARITY UK (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yousuf Ahmed Hassan Al-Hammadi | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Abdulrahman Dabwan Saif | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Saleh Mohd F G Al-Marri | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.24k | £32.51k | £15.97k | £1.94k | £2.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.97k | £48.41k | £0 | £1.82m | £711.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE. 2.TO RELIEF THE NEED OF PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE. 3.THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE OR CATASTROPHE. 4.SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Prestons Chartered Accountants
364-368 Cranbrook Road
ILFORD
Essex
IG2 6HY
- Phone:
- 07881582658
- Email:
- INFO@NECTARTRUST.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window