BIOSPHERE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CONSERVATION PRESERVATION SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT EDUCATION RESEARCH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 January 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL MILNER | Chair | 08 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Carl Whitehead | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MILNER | Trustee | 08 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £946 | £41 | £50 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 233 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 233 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 04 December 2023 | 430 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 02 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/12/2011
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSEVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMNENT. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST SCIENTISTS) ON THE SUBJECT OF 'THE ENVIRONMENT' AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS. 3) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHEIVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY ARE DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS."
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Quartons gardens Cottage
Crossgates
SCARBOROUGH
North Yorkshire
YO12 4ND
- Phone:
- 07964767787
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window