ST MARYS SECRET GARDEN LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing education in the subjects of gardening, conservation and food production. Promoting social inclusion, relieving the needs of those people who are excluded and assisting them to integrate through gardening. Provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities or for the public at large in the interests of social welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £14,420 from 1 government contract(s) and £71,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
- City Of London
- Hackney
- Islington
- Lewisham
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 14 May 2013: Standard registration
- ST MARYS SECRET GARDEN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Smithson | Chair | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pollyanna Rodrigues Goncalves | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eloise Rahman | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.14k | £179.42k | £99.56k | £210.17k | £146.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.54k | £159.29k | £142.89k | £155.72k | £183.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £31.25k | £31.49k | £23.37k | N/A | £14.42k | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.59k | £30.00k | £8.84k | £14.00k | £71.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 NOV 2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/07/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:(1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF GARDENING, CONSERVATION AND FOOD PRODUCTION.(2)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).(3)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HACKNEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.[NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND / OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
KIRK HILLS CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS
5 BARNFIELD CRESCENT
EXETER
EX1 1QT
- Phone:
- 01392474303
- Email:
- david@kirks.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window