Accounts and annual returns MAMA UPENDO CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1147156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 03 September 2024 187 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 03 September 2024 553 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 24 March 2022 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 07 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required