Financial history MAMA UPENDO CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1147156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £14.33k £4.55k £1.45k £1.32k £193
Total expenditure £13.94k £4.36k £1.93k £1.05k £783
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A