MAMA UPENDO CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mama Upendo Children's Trust is the UK arm of the Mama Upendo Children's Home in Kitui, Kenya. We have 56 children that we house, educate and care for in a tiny compound. The children range in age from 3 to 18. Education is a major expense. We fund raise but also have a close managerial presence there, working closely with the Manager at the orphanage. We aim to provide a safe and loving home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
- Kenya
Governance
- 08 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Jane Badenhorst | Chair | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Cabell Livingston Hopkins | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Edwards | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HILDA NYIVA HILLMAN | Trustee | 19 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.33k | £4.55k | £1.45k | £1.32k | £193 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.94k | £4.36k | £1.93k | £1.05k | £783 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 September 2024 | 553 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED ON 03/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN LIVING IN KENYA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND SUPPORT TO EXISTING CHARITIES IN KENYA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Firs
Little Keyford Lane
Frome
BA11 5BB
- Phone:
- 07715499819
- Email:
- s.hillman@talktalk.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window