Financial history DENTON YOUTH AND COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1150041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £100.15k £107.12k £77.67k £137.47k £186.65k
Total expenditure £101.51k £83.41k £80.49k £119.76k £199.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.81k £30.93k £10.50k £8.50k £8.50k