INTERSERVE EMPLOYEE FOUNDATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The ultimate aim of the Foundation is to improve the quality of life and life chances for people in the community where employess of Interserve live and operate, utilising the skills, capabilities, resources and enthusiasm of Interserve employees. This is through many fundraising activities, operational projects and giving a day of our time to projects that are important to us.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Australia
- Bahrain
- Chile
- China
- India
- Nepal
- New Zealand
- Oman
- Philippines
- Portugal
- Qatar
- Saudi Arabia
- South Africa
- Spain
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 09 January 2012: Standard registration
- 10 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- INTERSERVE EMPLOYEE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.83k | £213.74k | £200.38k | £72.16k | £7.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.39k | £183.30k | £190.36k | £90.38k | £34.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 30 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 09 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 09 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 05 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 05 October 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/12/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WHERE THE INTERSERVE GROUP OPERATES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE AND FACILITIES AND ALL THE NECESSARY ANCILLARY SUPPORT REQUIRED WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window