JIGSAW HOMES TAMESIDE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing homes or hostels and any associated amenities, services, advice or assistance for persons in necessitous circumstances with the object of relieving poverty and improving the conditions of life for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£81,375,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £77.68m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £3.70m |
Total expenditure:
£64,525,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £64.53m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,147,522 from 7 government contract(s) and £2,599,300 from 7 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £64.53m | |
Retained for future use | £16.85m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oldham
- Tameside
Governance
- 16 March 2012: Standard registration
- 02 April 2025: Removed (Exempt charity)
- NEW CHARTER HOMES LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.63m | £78.28m | £80.46m | £82.57m | £81.38m | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.71m | £49.11m | £56.62m | £66.28m | £64.53m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.58m | £5.05m | £4.95m | £4.88m | £1.15m | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.08m | £2.90m | £2.93m | £2.77m | £2.60m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £71.49m | £70.16m | £72.65m | £74.71m | £77.68m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.02m | £1.34m | £2.20m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £7.12m | £6.79m | £5.61m | £7.87m | £3.70m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £57.71m | £49.11m | £56.62m | £66.28m | £64.53m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £473.19m | £472.48m | £479.08m | £488.55m | £495.61m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £465.00k | £430.00k | |
|
Other assets | £44.02m | £46.26m | £28.64m | £18.85m | £15.16m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £347.89m | £339.49m | £323.27m | £321.25m | £323.32m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2013 as amended on 20 Mar 2019 as amended on 27 Jan 2021 as amended on 22 Dec 2021 as amended on 06 Apr 2023 as amended on 05 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS SHALL BE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE INDUSTRY BUSINESS OR TRADE OF: 1. PROVIDING SOCIAL HOUSING, HOMES OR HOSTELS AND/OR ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 2. PROVIDING FOR PERSON IN NEED THEREOF AND IN PARTICULAR FOR ELDERLY OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE OR PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY (INCLUDING MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND LEARNING OR ASSOCIATED DISABILITIES) IN NEED THEREOF HOMES OR HOSTELS AND/OR ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3 PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF AND IN PARTICULAR FOR ELDERLY OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE OR PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY (INCLUDING MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND LEARNING OR ASSOCIATED DISABILITIES) IN NEED THEREOF AND/OR PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 4. THE PROVISION OF RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS PRIMARILY OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK OR FOR SIMILAR PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF; 5. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS PRIMARILY OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK OR FOR SIMILAR PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF; 6. THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF REGENERATION PRIMARILY IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK OR WITHIN OTHER AREAS IN NEED THEREOF; 7. THE CARRYING OUT OF REGENERATION WORK WITH A COMMUNITY BENEFIT DERIVED THEREBY; 8. CARRYING OUT ANY OTHER OBJECT THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A COMPANY REGISTERED AS A SOCIAL LANDLORD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY; 9 THE COMPANY SHALL NOT TRADE FOR PROFIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window