PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S CHURCH. TIVERTON, DEVON.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Peter's Parochial Church Council is responsible for the running and maintainance of St.Peter's Church Tiverton for the benefit of the congregation and wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 20 February 2012: Previously excepted registration
- ST PETER'S, TIVERTON (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christian Derek Jonathan Hill | Chair | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DAVID CATCHPOLE | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM EDWARD ZARRETT | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Susannah Louise Milburn Emson | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Heritage | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Mitchell | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Varenne Brewster | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicolette Rosalie Johnson | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Cobbledick | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Mundy | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Hall-Tomkin | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Henshall | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Ricks Dip Archit | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.04k | £77.78k | £89.73k | £75.28k | £71.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.76k | £87.97k | £384.46k | £398.86k | £279.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Peter's Church
St Peter Street
Tiverton
Devon
EX16 6RP
- Phone:
- 01884 242991
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window