JUDAH CITY OF PRAISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Small Ministries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barbados
- China
- Cyprus
- Ghana
- Jamaica
- Nigeria
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- South Korea
- St Kitts And Nevis
- Thailand
Governance
- 25 October 2012: Standard registration
- GGM (Working name)
- GREATER GRACE MINISTRIES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN NATHAN GARDENER | Chair | 28 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Joanna David | Trustee | 15 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN SAMUEL SWABY | Trustee | 28 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1578 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR ABROAD 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION IN THE FORM OF BIBLE STUDIES, YOUTH CHRISTIAN EDUCATION, AND CHRISTIAN HISTORICAL EDUCATION SESSIONS. 3. THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN OUR LOCAL AREA SUFFERING OR IN NEED BY REASON OF ADDICTION TO VARIOUS SUBSTANCES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT. 4. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
373 NORWOOD ROAD
WEST NORWOOD
LONDON
SE27 9BQ
- Phone:
- 02084058260
- Email:
- stevieghome@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window