Accounts and annual returns WATERWISE WARRIORS UK

Charity number: 1145541
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2014 02 November 2015 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 09 February 2015 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required