HERNE BAY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Football based activities including training and education for children in the Community of Herne Bay and the surrounding areas. We aim to promote a healthy lifestyle through the enjoyment of playing football in a safe and friendly environment. These activities are available to players of all abilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 26 March 2012: Standard registration
- HBYFC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Cook | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Hills | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karim Chaoui | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jason Adby | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Carol Elder | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carl Born | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jon Warden | Trustee | 01 January 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.71k | £41.38k | £141.11k | £116.30k | £222.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.73k | £26.28k | £106.07k | £68.03k | £194.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 242 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 242 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 April 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 April 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 October 2022 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 18 October 2022 | 201 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 18 October 2022 | 566 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 18 October 2022 | 566 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/12/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN HERNE BAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL FOR CHILDREN UP TO 18 YEARS OF AGE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Dering Road
Herne Bay
CT6 5RD
- Phone:
- 01227740942
- Email:
- hbyfctreasurer@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window