Trustees HERNE BAY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1146585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Cook Trustee 12 October 2024
None on record
Ian Hills Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Karim Chaoui Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Jason Adby Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Yvonne Carol Elder Trustee 15 February 2022
None on record
Carl Born Trustee 08 February 2022
None on record
Jon Warden Trustee 01 January 2012
HERNE BAY SPORTS HUB
Received: 221 days late