JERICHO ROAD PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Jericho Road Project works with women affected by the sex industry in the city of Nottingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,200 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 02 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMYR HUW DAVIES | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
TINA LEONARDI | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|||||
ANDREA KELLY SHEA | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
KAY WAINMAN | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PATRICIA CLARK | Trustee | 11 January 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.90k | £184.93k | £163.08k | £100.15k | £127.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.94k | £164.23k | £151.69k | £113.98k | £135.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.50k | £11.25k | £20.00k | £10.00k | £10.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 19 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
I. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. II. TO AID PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR INVOLVEMENT IN THE SEX INDUSTRY AND/OR DRUG ABUSE AND/OR HOMELESSNESS OR THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF BECOMING INVOLVED IN SUCH IN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. III. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST SEX INDUSTRY WORKERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND ADVICE ON HEALTH, HOUSING AND FINANCIAL ISSUES. IV. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE CONDITION AND NEEDS OF SEX INDUSTRY WORKERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A CHESTNUT GROVE
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 5AD
- Phone:
- 01158453691
- Email:
- admin@jerichoroad.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window