THE PERU MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF NEED IN PERU, PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS/TRAINING, COORDINATION OF AWARENESS-RAISING VISITS TO LEARN ABOUT POVERTY, EDUCATION, PROMOTING HUMAN AND SOCIETAL DEVELOPMENT IN PERU. WORKING WITH LOCAL PEOPLE TO CREATE RELEVANT PROJECTS WHICH ENHANCE QUALITY OF LIFE AND ASPIRATIONS.WORKING WITH AUTHORITIES AND OTHER AGENCIES TO RELIEVE NEED, PARTICULARLY IN EMERGENCY SITUATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Peru
Governance
- 08 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Graham | Chair | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Anne Everitt | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael John Everitt | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Joanne Marie Hopper Holdsworth | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tony Joy | Trustee | 29 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev DENNIS TINDALL | Trustee | 29 November 2014 |
|
|||||
ALLAN HARGREAVES | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|||||
GERARD MORAN | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS LIAM HUGH O'NEILL | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.90k | £50.72k | £68.26k | £34.95k | £83.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.89k | £47.71k | £52.37k | £52.65k | £76.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 DEC 2011
Charitable objects
(1)FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: A.THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST THE DISADVANTAGED POOR IN PERU BY THE PROVISION OF THE NECESSITIES OF LIFE, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD KITCHENS; B.THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AMONGST PERSONS IN PERU BY THE PROVISION OF TEACHERS, BOOKS, CLASSROOM AIDS, SCHOOLS AND SUCH OTHER MATERIAL AS IS NECESSARY FOR EDUCATIONAL ADVANCEMENT: C.THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICINES, VOLUNTEER MEDICAL STAFF, CLINICS, HOSPITALS, AND THE MOUNTING OF HEALTH EDUCATION CAMPAIGNS DESIGNED TO IMPROVE AND PRESERVE HEALTH; D.THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PEOPLE OF PERU, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; E.THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY THE SUPPORT OF FAITH BASED GROUPS IN THE PRACTICAL EXPRESSION OF THE GOSPEL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 Bloomfield Road
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL3 6RZ
- Phone:
- 01914173156
- Email:
- theperumission@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window