Financial history THE QUEENS HALL, NARBERTH

Charity Number: 1145741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/12/2020 27/12/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £321.03k £257.46k £116.44k £372.84k £493.74k
Total expenditure £221.37k £282.51k £81.88k £345.43k £462.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £195.15k £15.00k £49.03k £0 N/A