UNITED KINGDOM SEPSIS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educating Healthcare professionals, health commissioners, government organisations and the wider public to suspect sepsis, recognize sepsis and ensure that sepsis is treated as an emergency.Lobbying the government Providing Support to patients and their relatives including those bereaved by sepsis through the provision of accessible information and the development of support networks
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 March 2012: Standard registration
- 21 October 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 21 October 2015: Funds transferred to 1158843 UNITED KINGDOM SEPSIS TRUST LIMITED
- UK SEPSIS TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.87k | £110.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.59k | £85.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 25 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 18 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 25 March 2014 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 24 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2012
Charitable objects
I.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECT OF SEPSIS AND SEVERE SEPSIS. II. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF SEPSIS AND SEVERE SEPSIS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window