Financial history RAISING MY VOICE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £34.08k £99.59k £73.12k £31.58k £3.43k
Total expenditure £39.23k £89.67k £31.31k £65.83k £7.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.41k £4.00k N/A N/A