RAISING MY VOICE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of those in need because of financial hardship and ill health by the provision of counselling, advice and assistance(including legal representation), in particular but not exclusively, to persons who have made a disclosure in the public interest regarding malpractice or wrongdoing happening in the workplace.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 May 2012: Standard registration
- RMVF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEVRES OYA KEMAL CQSW | Chair | 28 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Smith | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
SANJEEVE KUMAR GUPTA | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.08k | £99.59k | £73.12k | £31.58k | £3.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.23k | £89.67k | £31.31k | £65.83k | £7.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.41k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 AUG 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND ILL HEALTH BY: 1. THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE (INCLUDING LEGAL REPRESENTATION), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO PERSONS WHO HAVE MADE A DISCLOSURE IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST REGARDING MALPRACTICE OR WRONGDOING HAPPENING IN A WORKPLACE, AND 2. PROVIDING SAFE EMERGENCY AND SHORT-TERM ACCOMMODATION AND LONGER-TERM SUPPORT FOR WOMEN EXPERIENCING OR FLEEING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND SEXUAL EXPLOITATION IN ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24B Freegrove Road
LONDON
N7 9JN
- Phone:
- 07932790247
- Email:
- Info@RMVF.ORG
- Website:
-
rmvf.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window