Accounts and annual returns Positive Action for Family and Youth
Charity number: 1147472

Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 23 September 2024 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 18 March 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window