OLYMPIA-WAFULA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing disabled people from becoming socially excluded and to relieve the needs of disabled people to assist them to integrate into society in such ways and by such means as are exclusively charitable as the trustees may from time to time determine. Activities include : social activities such as sports, coffee morning, trips etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Nepal
Governance
- 14 December 2012: Standard registration
- OLYMPIA-WAFULA FOUNDATION (OWF) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIUS CHETSEKO | Chair | 24 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Anne Wafula-Strike | Trustee | 07 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Kamau | Trustee | 12 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY WAFULA | Trustee | 24 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £2.52k | £1.05k | £575 | £12.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.03k | £3.97k | £627 | £1.02k | £7.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 December 2021 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 November 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11/12/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING DISABLED PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE TO ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY IN SUCH WAYS AND BY SUCH BY MEANS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
198 Willowfield
Harlow
CM18 6RZ
- Phone:
- 01279304993
- Website:
-
olympia-wafulafoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window