Accounts and annual returns EPIC LEEDS

Charity number: 1150572
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 December 2020 317 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required