Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF TSUNAMI ANIMAL PEOPLE ALLIANCE

Charity Number: 1147106
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 February 2016 06 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2016 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2015 16 May 2016 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2015 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2014 23 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2014 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2013 30 December 2013 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2013 Not Required