DENTAL MAVERICKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting, organising and developing good dental health and education by working with practices, dentists and nurses to take the children in Morocco out of dental pain
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lebanon
- Morocco
Governance
- 13 February 2012: Standard registration
- DENTAL MAVERICKS - ENDING DAILY DENTAL PAIN FOR THE CHILDREN OF NORTH AFRICA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
gill bird | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
gautam sharma | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Howarth | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Gedge | Trustee | 13 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.33k | £55.09k | £33.57k | £46.42k | £79.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.90k | £39.59k | £21.67k | £29.02k | £53.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE, ORGANISE AND DEVELOP GOOD DENTAL HEALTH AND EDUCATION THEREOF, INCLUDING THE DIRECT PROVISION OF DENTISTRY, TO THIRD WORLD POPULATIONS WITH PARTICULAR DIRECTION TOWARDS CHILDREN IN NORTH AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carolyn Gedge
33 FRANK PARKINSON COURT
GUISELEY
LEEDS
LS20 9EY
- Phone:
- 07757705113
- Email:
- CALLY@DENTALMAVERICKS.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window