Financial history JAGAT GURU VALMIK JI MAHARAJ MANDIR GIAN ASHRAM U.K.

Charity number: 1145785
Charity reporting is up to date (143 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £29.64k £24.22k £26.46k £25.59k £35.67k
Total expenditure £26.34k £21.35k £24.34k £26.28k £38.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A