JAGAT GURU VALMIK JI MAHARAJ MANDIR GIAN ASHRAM U.K.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding of Prayer meeting, Public celebration of religious festivals, Printing/distribution of literature on Valmiki teaching to enlighting about the Valmiki religion with ( Ramayan/Yog Vasistha), Celebration of Diwali festival. Marriage and engagements arrangement is done at the premises. Women meeting, Youth activities and Support of Elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 07 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TEJU RAM | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
PARGAN BHAGANIA | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
NATHA SINGH | Trustee | 07 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.64k | £24.22k | £26.46k | £25.59k | £35.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.34k | £21.35k | £24.34k | £26.28k | £38.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 March 2025 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
23 March 2025 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 APR 2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE VALMIKI RELIGION IN THE UK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON VALMIKI TEACHINGS TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE VALMIKI RELIGION WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE WORKS OF:BHAGAVAN VALMIKI (RAMAYANA AND YOG VASISTHA); AND SRI SRI 108 SAT GURU GIAN NATH JI MAHARAJ (DHARM SHASTAR)
Contact information
- Address:
-
5-7 Booth Street
BIRMINGHAM
B21 0NG
- Phone:
- 07515002412
- Email:
- ValmikMandirUK@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window