Accounts and annual returns TOLLESHUNT D'ARCY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1146436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 03 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 03 October 2024 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 03 October 2024 125 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 July 2023 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 19 July 2023 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 19 July 2023 414 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 19 July 2023 414 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 02 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window