Financial history TOLLESHUNT D'ARCY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1146436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £76.18k £93.25k £85.53k £98.87k £113.42k
Total expenditure £78.92k £97.75k £95.43k £99.27k £104.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £63.05k N/A N/A N/A N/A