TOLLESHUNT D'ARCY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community pre-school delivering the EYFS to children aged 2-5.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 16 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Selby | Chair | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Libby Newman | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shannon Knights | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.18k | £93.25k | £85.53k | £98.87k | £113.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.92k | £97.75k | £95.43k | £99.27k | £104.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £63.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 July 2023 | 414 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 19 July 2023 | 414 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAR 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE GROUP ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY:- 1) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ATIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY. 2) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS. 3) INSITIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
At Tolleshunt D'Arcy Primary School
Tollesbury Road
Tolleshunt D'Arcy
Maldon
Essex
CM9 8UB
- Phone:
- 01621868948
- Email:
- enquiriestdps@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window