ST MARY'S CHURCH SWANSEA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church as a charity raises money for Christian Aid, Royal British Legion (Remembrance Day), Armed Forces, Bishop's appeals (various). Missionary work via the Church and the benefice as a whole.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 08 March 2012: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S CHURCH SWANSEA (Working name)
- RECTORIAL BENEFICE OF CENTRAL SWANSEA (Previous name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE RECTORIAL BENEFICE OF CENTRAL SWANSEA (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Justin Davies | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|||||||
Helen Murray | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVIES BSC | Trustee | 07 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.39k | £90.07k | £68.13k | £117.37k | £97.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.93k | £119.92k | £78.16k | £112.60k | £111.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.25k | £4.97k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956 as amended on 16 May 2023
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Mary's Church
St. Marys Square
SWANSEA
West Glamorgan
SA1 3LP
- Phone:
- 01792655489
- Email:
- stmarysswansea@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window