ST MICHAELS EAST WICKHAM PTA

Charity Number: 1146041
Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a school PTA and run various activities to raise funds and donate the proceeds to help the pupils within the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £10,652
Total expenditure: £18,387

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bexley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zoe Alison Stokes Chair 15 October 2019
None on record
Lauren Taylor Trustee 17 November 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £17.26k £12.59k £4.96k £4.62k £10.65k
Total expenditure £7.29k £10.39k £4.24k £2.10k £18.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 July 2024 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 June 2022 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 March 2021 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Farnham Road
WELLING
DA16 1LQ
Phone:
02036546308