GREENWICH GURKHA EX-SERVICEMEN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable Activities during the period: 1. Celebrated Nepalese New Year Fri 13 Apr 2012. 2. Visited to Isle of Wight Sat 25 Aug 2012. 3. Celebrated Nepalese festival Tihar on Fri 02 Nov 2012. 4. Attended the Armed forces day on Sat 30 Jun 2012 and Remembrance Day on Sun 11 Nov 2012.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
Total income includes £30,770 from 1 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greenwich
- Nepal
Governance
- 15 February 2012: Standard registration
- GGESA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tul Maya Rai | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ash Bahadur Gurung | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Om Parsad Gurung | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Siridhoj Limbu | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bhim Bahadur Ghale Gurung | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rewat Bahadur Thapa | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bishnu Kumari Gurung | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prem Jung Shahi | Trustee | 24 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hari Kumar Malla | Trustee | 24 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.33k | £40.43k | £55.36k | £54.72k | £54.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.54k | £33.18k | £51.97k | £56.47k | £56.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.77k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 179 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 229 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 January 2023
(These accounts |
16 July 2024 | 229 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 26 April 2023 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 26 April 2023 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 121 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE OF EX-GURKHA COMMUNITIES. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES OF THE MEMBER OF THE EX-GURKHA COMMUNITY. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENGLISH LANGUAGE COMPETENCE FOR MEN AND WOMEN OF GURKHA AND BROADER NEPALI COMMUNITIES. THE PROMOTION OF GOOD RELATION AND EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BETWEEN PERSONS OF EX-GURKHAS COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Wernbrook Street
LONDON
SE18 7RX
- Phone:
- 07578906395
- Email:
- om_ghamrang@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window