NORFOLK COMMUNITY TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- NCTA is passionate about community transport (CT). - Its role is to ensure that all who use and support CT are well informed about CT's work and positive impact in society. - To promote best practice amongst operators. - To help operators cut costs and secure funding. - To raise the profile and image of community transport and champion the vital work the operators do.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income includes £29,100 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 12 July 2012: Standard registration
- 11 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NCTA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £213.48k | £128.59k | £141.93k | £131.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.85k | £133.09k | £122.79k | £128.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.50k | £46.40k | £29.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 13 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 13 September 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 09 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 09 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 01 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 01 December 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/09/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY DELIVERS A PUBLIC BENEFIT SERVICE BY FACILITATING LOCAL GROUPS TO PROVIDE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICES FOR PEOPLE IN NORFOLK WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) OR POVERTY OR A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC TRANSPORT SERVICES. IN FURTHERANCE OF ITS OBJECTS THE CHARITY WILL DELIVER BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS : (1) SUPPORT EXISTING AND POTENTIAL COMMUNITY TRANSPORT ORGANISATIONS TO DEVELOP, STRENGTHEN AND IMPROVE THE SERVICES THEY PROVIDE FOR THEIR BENEFICIARIES (2) ASSIST IN IDENTIFYING AND IMPLEMENTING ARRANGEMENTS THAT WILL HELP MAKE THE PROVISION OF THESE SERVICES FINANCIALLY SECURE (3) FOSTER AND MAINTAIN POSITIVE RELATIONSHIPS WITH POTENTIAL AND EXISTING FUNDERS AND OTHER AGENCIES AND BODIES THAT HAVE AN INTEREST IN THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICES (4) PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A FORUM WHERE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT ORGANISATIONS CAN JOIN TOGETHER TO FIND MUTUAL SUPPORT, SHARE COMMON ISSUES AND INFORMATION (5) REPRESENT THE VIEWS OF AND CREATE A COLLECTIVE VOICE FOR THE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SECTOR IN NORFOLK (6) PROMOTE EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES WITHIN THE COMMUNITY, AND TO WORK AGAINST DISCRIMINATION OF PEOPLE ON THE BASIS OF ETHNICITY, AGE, SEX, SEXUALITY, DISABILITY, RELIGION OR CULTURE (7) CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS THE FURTHER WORKINGS AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE TRANSPORT SECTOR IN NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window