THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ALL SAINTS, LYDD, ST. PETER'S, GREATSTONE AND THE SANCTUARY, DUNGENESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in the Ecclesiastical Parish the whole mission of the Church. Supporting Charities as authorised by the Parochial Church Council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 29 March 2012: Previously excepted registration
- THE PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, LYDD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Rosemary Moon | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Botten | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Darling | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|||||
JOSEPH THOMAS BUTTERWORTH | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Ronald Carter | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY CARTER | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £272.84k | £116.65k | £82.16k | £79.41k | £81.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.99k | £309.65k | £82.97k | £72.63k | £74.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2024 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2024 | 315 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 February 2023 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 February 2023 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 February 2021 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 February 2021 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Rectory
Park Street
Lydd
Romney Marsh
TN29 9AY
- Phone:
- 01797320345
- Email:
- claret1912nigel@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window